+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (45)
On May 14, 2013 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Considered in formal meeting
On May 9, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Energy Resources
- Read first time
On May 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Amendment(s) offered
- Record vote
- Amendment(s) offered
- Record vote
- Amendment tabled
- Amendment(s) offered
- Amendment withdrawn
- Amended
- Record vote
- Amendment tabled
- Amendment(s) offered
- Read 2nd time
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Amendment(s) offered
- Amendment tabled
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
On May 2, 2013 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On May 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Amendment(s) offered
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
- Reported engrossed
- Three day rule suspended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Passed to engrossment as amended
- Amendment withdrawn
- Amendment(s) offered
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Amended
On April 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
- Co-author authorized
On April 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
On April 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Natural Resources
- Read first time
On March 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate