+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (51)
On June 10, 2019 in the House:
- Effective on 9/1/19
- Signed by the Governor
On May 25, 2019 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
- Signed in the House
On May 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported enrolled
- House passage reported
On May 21, 2019 in the House:
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
On May 20, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on General State Calendar
- Read 2nd time
- Passed to 3rd reading
On May 17, 2019 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On May 16, 2019 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On May 15, 2019 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On May 13, 2019 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Vote reconsidered in committee
- Considered in formal meeting
On May 10, 2019 in the House:
- Reported favorably as amended
- Amendment(s) considered in committee
- Considered in formal meeting
On May 8, 2019 in the House:
- Meeting cancelled
- Scheduled for public hearing on5/8/2019
On May 7, 2019 in the House:
- Posting rule suspended
On May 6, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Public Health
- Read first time
On April 30, 2019 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On April 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported engrossed
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
- Record vote
- Three day rule suspended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
On April 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On April 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably as substituted
On April 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
On April 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on 4/16/2019
On March 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Health & Human Services
- Read first time
On March 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor