+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (98)
On June 14, 2013 in the House:
- See remarks for effective date
- Signed by the Governor
On May 28, 2013 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 27, 2013 in the House:
- Signed in the House
On May 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
- Reported enrolled
- House adopts conf. comm. report-reported
On May 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Record vote
- Rules suspended
- Record vote
- Senate adopts conference committee report
- Remarks ordered printed
On May 26, 2013 in the House:
- Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
- House adopts conference committee report
- Record vote
On May 25, 2013 in the House:
- Conf. Comm. Report distributed
On May 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Conference committee report filed
On May 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- House appoints conferees-reported
- House grants request for conf comm-reported
On May 22, 2013 in the House:
- House appoints conferees
- House grants request for conference committee
On May 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate refuses to concur
- House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
- Read
On May 21, 2013 in the House:
- Senate appoints conferees-reported
On May 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate requests conference committee
- Senate appoints conferees
On May 21, 2013 in the House:
- Senate refuses to concur-reported
- Senate requests conference committee-reported
On May 15, 2013 in the House:
- Read 3rd time
- Amended
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
- Amendment fails of adoption
- Record vote
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Passed as amended
- Record vote
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
On May 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- House passage as amended reported
On May 14, 2013 in the House:
- Amendment amended
- Read 2nd time
- Amended
- Amendment(s) offered
- Placed on Major State Calendar
- Amendment adopted as amended
- Amendment(s) offered
- Amendment amended
- Amendment adopted as amended
- Amended
- Passed to 3rd reading as amended
On May 10, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On April 24, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On April 23, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 17, 2013 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Considered in public hearing
On April 15, 2013 in the House:
- Read first time
- Referred to State Affairs
On April 12, 2013 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On April 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Read 2nd time
- Amendment(s) offered
- Amended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Amendment(s) offered
- Amended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Amendment(s) offered
- Amended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Amended
- Amendment(s) offered
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Amendment(s) offered
- Amended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Passed to engrossment as amended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Three day rule suspended
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
- Reported engrossed
On April 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- Not again placed on intent calendar
On April 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On April 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
On April 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
On March 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to State Affairs
- Read first time
On March 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate