+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (80)
On June 7, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor
- Effective on 9/1/19
On May 25, 2019 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
- Signed in the House
On May 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported enrolled
On May 21, 2019 in the House:
- Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
On May 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Record vote
- Senate concurs in House amendment(s)
- Read
- House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
On May 15, 2019 in the House:
- Amended
- Read 3rd time
- Amendment(s) offered
- Point of order withdrawn (amendment)
- Amended
- Amendment withdrawn
- Point of order withdrawn
- Point of order withdrawn
- Passed as amended
- Record vote
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
On May 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- House passage as amended reported
On May 15, 2019 in the House:
- Point of order overruled
On May 14, 2019 in the House:
- Amendment tabled
- Placed on General State Calendar
- Read 2nd time
- Amended
- Amended
- Amended
- Amended
- Record vote
- Record vote
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Amendment tabled
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Point of order overruled
- Amended
- Passed to 3rd reading as amended
On May 10, 2019 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On April 25, 2019 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On April 24, 2019 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 15, 2019 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Considered in formal meeting
On April 11, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Public Health
- Read first time
On April 10, 2019 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On April 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Co-author authorized
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Read 2nd time
- Amendment(s) offered
- Amended
- Record vote
- Passed to engrossment as amended
- Record vote
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
- Reported engrossed
On April 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On April 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Co-author authorized
On April 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Reported favorably as substituted
On April 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
On March 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on 3/18/2019
On March 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Co-author authorized
On March 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Co-author authorized
On March 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Co-author authorized
On March 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to State Affairs
- Read first time
On February 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Co-author authorized
On February 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsors (42)
Type:
Primary Sponsor