+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (77)
On June 14, 2013 in the House:
- Effective on 9/1/13
- Signed by the Governor
On May 28, 2013 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 27, 2013 in the House:
- Signed in the House
On May 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 26, 2013 in the House:
- Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
On May 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported enrolled
On May 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Record vote
- Senate concurs in House amendment(s)
- Read
- House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
On May 22, 2013 in the House:
- Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal
- Read 3rd time
- Amended
On May 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- House passage as amended reported
On May 22, 2013 in the House:
- Passed as amended
- Record vote
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
On May 21, 2013 in the House:
- Laid out as postponed business
- Point of order overruled
- Postponed
- Laid out as postponed business
- Record vote
- Point of order overruled
- Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal
- Passed to 3rd reading
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
On May 20, 2013 in the House:
- Postponed
- Point of order withdrawn
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on General State Calendar
On May 16, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On May 6, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On May 5, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
On May 4, 2013 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On May 1, 2013 in the House:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
On April 15, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Economic & Small Business Development
- Read first time
On April 12, 2013 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On April 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Read 2nd time
- Amendment(s) offered
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Amendment(s) offered
- Amended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Passed to engrossment as amended
- Amended
- Three day rule suspended
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Postponed
- Laid out as postponed business
- Amendment(s) offered
- Amended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Passed as amended
- Record vote
- Reported engrossed
On April 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
- Co-author authorized
On April 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Reported favorably as substituted
On April 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On February 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Economic Development
- Read first time
On February 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsors (16)
Type:
Primary Sponsor