+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (37)
On May 25, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on General State Calendar
On May 23, 2021 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
- Considered in Calendars
On May 22, 2021 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On May 20, 2021 in the House:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in formal meeting
On May 18, 2021 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
- Referred to Public Education
- Read first time
On May 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Co-author authorized
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Record vote
- Read 2nd time
- Amendment(s) offered
- Amendment withdrawn
- Passed to engrossment
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Three day rule suspended
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
- Reported engrossed
On May 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On May 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Committee report printed and distributed
On May 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
On May 6, 2021 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on 5/6/2021
On April 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Education
- Read first time
On March 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate