+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On April 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Co-author authorized
On April 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Co-author authorized
On April 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Co-author authorized
On April 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Co-author authorized
On April 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- Co-author authorized
On April 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Finance
- Read first time
On March 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Co-author authorized
On March 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Co-author authorized
On March 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor