+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (53)
On June 14, 2013 in the House:
- See remarks for effective date
- Signed by the Governor
On May 26, 2013 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
- Signed in the House
On May 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported enrolled
On May 21, 2013 in the House:
- Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
On May 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Record vote
- Senate concurs in House amendment(s)
- Read
- House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
On May 17, 2013 in the House:
- Constitutional three day rule suspended
- Read 3rd time
- Record vote
- Passed
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
On May 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- House passage as amended reported
On May 16, 2013 in the House:
- Passed to 3rd reading as amended
- Amended
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on Major State Calendar
On May 13, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
- Committee report sent to Calendars
- Committee report distributed
On May 10, 2013 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On May 6, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in public hearing
- Vote reconsidered in committee
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
On April 24, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence
- Read first time
- Received from the Senate
On April 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Three day rule suspended
- Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
- Reported engrossed
On April 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On April 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
On April 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
On April 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Jurisprudence
- Read first time
On March 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate