+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (42)
On May 19, 2019 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
- Committee report distributed
On May 18, 2019 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On May 17, 2019 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Considered in formal meeting
On May 16, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to State Affairs
- Read first time
On May 15, 2019 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On May 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Amendment(s) offered
- Co-author authorized
- Placed on intent calendar
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Record vote
- Read 2nd time
- Amended
- Record vote
- Amendment(s) offered
- Amended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Passed to engrossment as amended
- Record vote
- Three day rule suspended
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
- Reported engrossed
On May 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Not again placed on intent calendar
On May 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On May 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
On April 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
On April 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on 4/10/2019
On March 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Co-author authorized
On March 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Health & Human Services
- Read first time
On March 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Co-author authorized
On March 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsors (34)
Type:
Primary Sponsor