+ − Actions (50)
On June 19, 2009 in the House:
- Effective on 9/1/09
- Signed by the Governor
On June 1, 2009 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 31, 2009 in the House:
- Signed in the House
On May 30, 2009 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 28, 2009 in the Senate:
- Reported enrolled
- House passage reported
On May 27, 2009 in the House:
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
- Passed to 3rd reading
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
On May 25, 2009 in the House:
- Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
On May 23, 2009 in the House:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
On May 22, 2009 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
- Considered in formal meeting
- Scheduled for formal meeting on . . .
On May 15, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to Elections
- Read first time
On May 11, 2009 in the Senate:
- Passed to engrossment as amended
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Read 2nd time
- Amendment(s) offered
- Amended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Three day rule suspended
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Reported engrossed
On May 11, 2009 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On May 8, 2009 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On May 7, 2009 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Committee report printed and distributed
On May 4, 2009 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
On April 30, 2009 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 31, 2009 in the Senate:
- Referred to State Affairs
- Read first time
On March 13, 2009 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor