+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (46)
On June 15, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor
- Effective immediately
On May 27, 2017 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
- Signed in the House
On May 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported enrolled
On May 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- House passage reported
On May 24, 2017 in the House:
- Passed to 3rd reading
- Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
- Read 2nd time
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
On May 21, 2017 in the House:
- Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
On May 19, 2017 in the House:
- Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
- Considered in formal meeting
- Scheduled for formal meeting on . . .
On May 16, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Public Education
- Read first time
On May 15, 2017 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On May 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On May 12, 2017 in the Senate:
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
- Record vote
- Three day rule suspended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
- Laid before the Senate
- Placed on local & uncontested calendar
- Reported engrossed
On May 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
On May 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
On April 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Education
- Read first time
On March 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate