+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (46)
On June 14, 2019 in the House:
- Effective on 9/1/19
- Signed by the Governor
On May 25, 2019 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
- Signed in the House
On May 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported enrolled
On May 22, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
- Read 2nd time
- Passed to 3rd reading
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
On May 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- House passage reported
On May 20, 2019 in the House:
- Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
On May 16, 2019 in the House:
- Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
- Committee report distributed
On May 15, 2019 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On May 14, 2019 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
- Considered in formal meeting
On May 13, 2019 in the House:
- Read first time
- Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence
On May 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Three day rule suspended
On May 10, 2019 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On May 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Laid before the Senate
- Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Placed on local & uncontested calendar
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
- Reported engrossed
On May 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
- Considered in public hearing
On April 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on 4/24/2019
On February 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Criminal Justice
- Read first time
On November 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate