+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (110)
On June 18, 2015 in the House:
- Effective on 9/1/15
- Signed by the Governor
On June 1, 2015 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
- Signed in the House
On June 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 31, 2015 in the House:
- Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
On May 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported enrolled
- Record vote
- Senate adopts conference committee report
- House adopts conf. comm. report-reported
On May 30, 2015 in the House:
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- House adopts conference committee report
On May 29, 2015 in the House:
- Conf. Comm. Report distributed
On May 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- House grants request for conf comm-reported
- House appoints conferees-reported
- Conference committee report filed
On May 27, 2015 in the House:
- House appoints conferees
- House grants request for conference committee
On May 26, 2015 in the House:
- Senate appoints conferees-reported
- Senate requests conference committee-reported
- Senate refuses to concur-reported
On May 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate appoints conferees
- Senate requests conference committee
- Read
- House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
- Senate refuses to concur
On May 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- House passage as amended reported
On May 24, 2015 in the House:
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
On May 23, 2015 in the House:
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on Major State Calendar
- Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal
- Passed to 3rd reading
On May 21, 2015 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
- Committee report sent to Calendars
- Committee report distributed
On May 20, 2015 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On May 18, 2015 in the House:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in formal meeting
On May 11, 2015 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On May 5, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Human Services
- Correction in referral
On April 29, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to General Investigating & Ethics
- Read first time
On April 22, 2015 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On April 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Amended
- Amendment(s) offered
- Amended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Amended
- Amendment(s) offered
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Amendment(s) offered
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Amended
- Amendment(s) offered
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Amended
- Amendment(s) offered
- Read 2nd time
- Amended
- Amendment(s) offered
- Read 3rd time
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Amended
- Amendment(s) offered
- Record vote
- Passed
- Record vote
- Three day rule suspended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Passed to engrossment as amended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Reported engrossed
- Amendment(s) offered
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Amendment adopted as amended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Amendment amended
- Amendment to amendment offered
- Amendment(s) offered
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Amended
On April 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On April 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Not again placed on intent calendar
On April 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On April 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Not again placed on intent calendar
On April 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On April 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Reported favorably as substituted
On April 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
On March 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Considered in public hearing
On March 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Health & Human Services
- Read first time
On March 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate