+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (140)
On May 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- House appoints conferees-reported
- House grants request for conf comm-reported
On May 27, 2015 in the House:
- House appoints conferees
- House grants request for conference committee
On May 26, 2015 in the House:
- Senate appoints conferees-reported
- Senate requests conference committee-reported
- Senate refuses to concur-reported
On May 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate appoints conferees
- Senate requests conference committee
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Senate refuses to concur
- Read
- House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
On May 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- House passage as amended reported
On May 24, 2015 in the House:
- Read 3rd time
- Postponed
- Passed
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Laid out as postponed business
- Record vote
On May 23, 2015 in the House:
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Amendment fails of adoption
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
- Amended
- Amended
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
- Amended
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
- Amended
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
- Amended
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
- Amendment withdrawn
- Postponed
- Record vote
- Amended
- Amendment(s) offered
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Amended
- Amended
- Amended
- Laid out as postponed business
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
- Point of order overruled
- Point of order overruled
- Point of order overruled
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on Major State Calendar
- Amended
- Point of order withdrawn
- Amended
- Postponed
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Passed to 3rd reading as amended
- Amendment adopted as amended
- Amendment amended
- Vote reconsidered
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
- Amendment adopted as amended
- Amendment amended
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
- Point of order withdrawn
- Laid out as postponed business
- Postponed
- Laid out as postponed business
- Vote reconsidered
- Point of order withdrawn
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
- Amended
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
- Amended
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
- Amended
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
- Amended
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
- Amended
- Amendment withdrawn
- Amendment(s) offered
- Amendment amended
- Amendment adopted as amended
On May 21, 2015 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
- Corrected committee report sent to Calendars
On May 20, 2015 in the House:
- Corrected comm. report distributed
- Corrected com rept filed w/ Comte Coordinator
On May 19, 2015 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On May 18, 2015 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On May 14, 2015 in the House:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in formal meeting
On April 29, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Human Services
- Read first time
On April 14, 2015 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On April 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported engrossed
- Amendment(s) offered
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Read 2nd time
- Amendment(s) offered
- Amended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Amendment(s) offered
- Record vote
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Amendment(s) offered
- Amended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Amended
- Amended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Amendment(s) offered
- Amended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Amendment(s) offered
- Amended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Passed to engrossment as amended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Three day rule suspended
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
On April 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On April 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Reported favorably as substituted
On April 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
On March 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Considered in public hearing
On March 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Health & Human Services
- Read first time
On March 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate