+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (44)
On June 16, 2015 in the House:
- Effective on 9/1/15
- Signed by the Governor
On May 26, 2015 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 25, 2015 in the House:
- Signed in the House
On May 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported enrolled
- House passage reported
On May 22, 2015 in the House:
- Read 2nd time
- Laid out in lieu of companion
- Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
- Passed to 3rd reading
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
On May 21, 2015 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On May 20, 2015 in the House:
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
- Considered in public hearing
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
On May 12, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Special Purpose Districts
- Read first time
On May 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Three day rule suspended
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
- Vote recorded in Journal
On May 11, 2015 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On May 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
- Reported engrossed
On May 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On May 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
On May 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
On April 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On April 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Intergovernmental Relations
- Read first time
On April 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor