+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (44)
On May 28, 2015 in the House:
- Effective immediately
- Filed without the Governor's signature
On May 20, 2015 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
- Signed in the House
On May 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported enrolled
- House passage reported
On May 18, 2015 in the House:
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
On May 14, 2015 in the House:
- Laid out in lieu of companion
- Read 2nd time
- Passed to 3rd reading
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
On May 11, 2015 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On May 7, 2015 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Considered in public hearing
On May 4, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to County Affairs
- Read first time
On April 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Three day rule suspended
- Placed on local & uncontested calendar
- Laid before the Senate
- Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
- Vote recorded in Journal
On April 30, 2015 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On April 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
- Reported engrossed
On April 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Co-author authorized
On April 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
On April 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
On April 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On April 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Intergovernmental Relations
- Read first time
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate