+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (26)
On May 2, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Natural Resources
- Read first time
On April 30, 2019 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On April 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported engrossed
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
- Record vote
- Three day rule suspended
- Record vote
- Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
- Record vote
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
On April 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On April 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Reported favorably as substituted
On April 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
- Posting rule suspended
On April 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on 4/15/2019
On March 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Water & Rural Affairs
- Read first time
On March 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor