+ − Actions (29)
On April 22, 2009 in the House:
- Read first time
- Referred to Higher Education
On April 21, 2009 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On April 20, 2009 in the Senate:
- Amended
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Read 2nd time
- Amendment(s) offered
- Amended
- Amendment(s) offered
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Passed to engrossment as amended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Three day rule suspended
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
- Reported engrossed
On April 16, 2009 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On April 14, 2009 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
On April 8, 2009 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 24, 2009 in the Senate:
- Referred to Higher Education
- Read first time
On March 12, 2009 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor