+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (11)
On May 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on local & uncontested calendar
On May 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
On May 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
On April 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 31, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Intergovernmental Relations
- Read first time
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor