+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (50)
On May 18, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor
- Effective in 90 days -- 8/26/13
On May 8, 2013 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
- Signed in the House
On May 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported enrolled
On May 7, 2013 in the House:
- Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
On May 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Record vote
- Senate concurs in House amendment(s)
- Read
- House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
On May 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- House passage as amended reported
On April 30, 2013 in the House:
- Amended
- Read 3rd time
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Passed as amended
- Record vote
On April 29, 2013 in the House:
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
- Passed to 3rd reading
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on Major State Calendar
On April 19, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On April 16, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On April 15, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 10, 2013 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Considered in public hearing
On April 4, 2013 in the House:
- Read first time
- Referred to Culture, Recreation & Tourism
On April 1, 2013 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On March 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Three day rule suspended
- Placed on local & uncontested calendar
- Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Laid before the Senate
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
- Reported engrossed
On March 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
On March 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On February 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Government Organization
- Read first time
On February 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate