+ − Actions (16)
On May 7, 2009 in the Senate:
- Not again placed on intent calendar
On May 4, 2009 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On April 29, 2009 in the Senate:
- Not again placed on intent calendar
- Co-author authorized
On April 21, 2009 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On April 14, 2009 in the Senate:
- Co-author authorized
On April 9, 2009 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Reported favorably as substituted
On April 6, 2009 in the Senate:
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On April 2, 2009 in the Senate:
- Co-author authorized
On March 24, 2009 in the Senate:
- Referred to State Affairs
- Read first time
On March 12, 2009 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate