+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (68)
On June 14, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor
- Effective on 9/1/13
On May 20, 2013 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
- Signed in the House
On May 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 20, 2013 in the House:
- Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
On May 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read
- House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
- Senate concurs in House amendment(s)
- Record vote
- Reported enrolled
On May 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- House passage as amended reported
On May 14, 2013 in the House:
- Record vote
- Passed
- Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal
- Read 3rd time
On May 13, 2013 in the House:
- Passed to 3rd reading
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on Major State Calendar
On May 10, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On April 26, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
- Committee report distributed
On April 25, 2013 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 22, 2013 in the House:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in formal meeting
On April 9, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Culture, Recreation & Tourism
- Read first time
On April 8, 2013 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On April 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Amendment(s) offered
- Amended
- Amendment(s) offered
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Amended
- Amendment(s) offered
- Amendment(s) offered
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Amended
- Read 2nd time
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Record vote
- Three day rule suspended
- Amendment to amendment offered
- Amendment to amendment withdrawn
- Motion to table
- Motion withdrawn
- Amended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Passed to engrossment as amended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
- Reported engrossed
On April 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On March 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
- Posting rule suspended
On March 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On February 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Administration
- Read first time
On February 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate