+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (111)
On June 4, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor
- Effective on 9/1/19
On May 28, 2019 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 27, 2019 in the House:
- Signed in the House
On May 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
- Reported enrolled
On May 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate adopts resolution for tech. correction
- Senate adopts resolution to go outside bounds
- Senate adopts conference committee report
- Record vote
On May 26, 2019 in the House:
- Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
- House adopts resolution to go outside bounds
- House adopts conference committee report
- Record vote
- House adopts resolution for tech. correction
On May 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- House adopts conf. comm. report-reported
On May 25, 2019 in the House:
- Conf. Comm. Report distributed
On May 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Conference committee report filed
On May 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate appoints conferees
- House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
- Read
- Senate refuses to concur
- Senate requests conference committee
On May 23, 2019 in the House:
- Senate requests conference committee-reported
- Senate refuses to concur-reported
- Senate appoints conferees-reported
- House grants request for conference committee
- House appoints conferees
On May 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- House grants request for conf comm-reported
- House appoints conferees-reported
On May 22, 2019 in the House:
- Amended
- Read 3rd time
- Amended
- Passed as amended
- Record vote
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
On May 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- House passage as amended reported
On May 21, 2019 in the House:
- Amended
- Placed on Major State Calendar
- Read 2nd time
- Amended
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Amended
- Record vote
- Amended
- Record vote
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Record vote
- Amended
- Record vote
- Passed to 3rd reading as amended
- Record vote
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Vote reconsidered
- Vote reconsidered
- Amendment withdrawn
- Passed to 3rd reading as amended
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
On May 19, 2019 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
- Committee report sent to Calendars
- Committee report distributed
On May 18, 2019 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On May 17, 2019 in the House:
- Recommitted to committee
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Considered in formal meeting
- Committee substitute considered in committee
On May 15, 2019 in the House:
- Postponed
- Laid out as postponed business
On May 13, 2019 in the House:
- Postponed
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on Major State Calendar
On May 10, 2019 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On April 25, 2019 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On April 24, 2019 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 23, 2019 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Considered in formal meeting
On April 2, 2019 in the House:
- Read first time
- Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence
On April 1, 2019 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On March 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Amended
- Co-author authorized
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Amendment(s) offered
- Amended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Amendment(s) offered
- Read 2nd time
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Passed to engrossment as amended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Three day rule suspended
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
- Reported engrossed
On March 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On March 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Co-author authorized
On March 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Co-author authorized
On March 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably as substituted
On March 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on 3/14/2019
On March 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to State Affairs
- Read first time
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsors (29)
Type:
Primary Sponsor