+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (90)
On August 9, 2017 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On August 8, 2017 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
- Committee report distributed
On August 4, 2017 in the House:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in formal meeting
On August 2, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Public Education
- Read first time
On July 27, 2017 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On July 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
- Laid before the Senate
- Record vote
- Statement(s) submitted
- Reported engrossed
On July 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Record vote
- Amendment(s) offered
- Amendment fails of adoption
- Record vote
- Amendment(s) offered
- Record vote
- Amendment fails of adoption
- Amendment(s) offered
- Amended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Amendment(s) offered
- Amendment withdrawn
- Amendment(s) offered
- Amendment fails of adoption
- Amended
- Record vote
- Amendment fails of adoption
- Amendment(s) offered
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Amended
- Amendment(s) offered
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Amendment(s) offered
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Amended
- Amendment(s) offered
- Read 2nd time
- Laid before the Senate
- Co-author authorized
- Amendment(s) offered
- Record vote
- Amendment fails of adoption
- Record vote
- Record vote
- Passed to engrossment as amended
- Amendment withdrawn
- Amendment(s) offered
- Record vote
- Amendment fails of adoption
- Amendment(s) offered
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Amendment(s) offered
- Amendment(s) offered
- Record vote
- Amendment fails of adoption
- Amendment(s) offered
- Amended
- Amendment fails of adoption
- Amended
- Amendment(s) offered
- Record vote
- Amendment(s) offered
- Amendment withdrawn
- Amendment(s) offered
- Amendment fails of adoption
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Amendment(s) offered
- Amendment fails of adoption
- Record vote
- Amendment(s) offered
- Amendment fails of adoption
- Record vote
On July 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
On July 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
- Considered in public hearing
- Testimony taken in committee
On July 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Record vote
- Rules suspended
- Point of order overruled
- Point of order
- Referred to Education
- Read first time
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate