+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (137)
On June 14, 2013 in the House:
- Effective on 9/1/13
- Signed by the Governor
On May 28, 2013 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 27, 2013 in the House:
- Signed in the House
On May 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
- Reported enrolled
On May 27, 2013 in the House:
- House adopts resolution for tech. correction
On May 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate adopts resolution for tech. correction
- Withdrawn by the Author
On May 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Remarks ordered printed
- Senate adopts conference committee report
- Record vote
On May 26, 2013 in the House:
- Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
- House adopts conference committee report
- Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal
- Record vote
On May 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- House adopts conf. comm. report-reported
On May 25, 2013 in the House:
- Conf. Comm. Report distributed
On May 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Conference committee report filed
On May 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- House appoints conferees-reported
- House grants request for conf comm-reported
On May 22, 2013 in the House:
- House appoints conferees
- House grants request for conference committee
On May 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate refuses to concur
- House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
- Read
- Senate requests conference committee
- Senate appoints conferees
On May 21, 2013 in the House:
- Senate refuses to concur-reported
- Senate requests conference committee-reported
- Senate appoints conferees-reported
On May 17, 2013 in the House:
- Read 3rd time
On May 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- House passage as amended reported
On May 17, 2013 in the House:
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Passed as amended
- Amended
- Constitutional three day rule suspended
On May 16, 2013 in the House:
- Amended
- Record vote
- Amendment(s) offered
- Amendment withdrawn
- Amended
- Amended
- Amendment withdrawn
- Postponed
- Amendment withdrawn
- Record vote
- Amendment fails of adoption
- Amended
- Laid out as postponed business
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on Major State Calendar
- Amended
- Amended
- Point of order overruled
- Amended
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Passed to 3rd reading as amended
- Amended
- Amended
- Amended
- Amended
- Amended
- Point of order overruled
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
- Amended
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
- Amended
- Amendment withdrawn
- Amended
- Point of order overruled
On May 15, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on General State Calendar
On May 14, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
- Considered in Calendars
On May 13, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On May 10, 2013 in the House:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in formal meeting
- Scheduled for formal meeting on . . .
- Recommitted to committee
- Considered in Calendars
On May 8, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On May 7, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 30, 2013 in the House:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
On April 23, 2013 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On April 16, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Public Education
- Read first time
On April 12, 2013 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On April 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported engrossed
- Amendment amended
- Co-author authorized
- Reason for vote recorded in Journal
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Read 2nd time
- Amendment(s) offered
- Amendment to amendment offered
- Amendment amended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Amendment to amendment offered
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Amendment adopted as amended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Passed to engrossment as amended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Three day rule suspended
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
On April 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On April 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Reported favorably as substituted
On March 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
- Considered in public hearing
On March 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- No action taken in committee
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On February 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On February 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Education
- Read first time
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate