+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (245)
On June 12, 2019 in the House:
- See remarks for effective date
- Signed by the Governor
On May 28, 2019 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 27, 2019 in the House:
- Signed in the House
On May 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
- Reported enrolled
- Senate adopts resolution for tech. correction
On May 27, 2019 in the House:
- House adopts resolution for tech. correction
On May 26, 2019 in the House:
- Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
On May 25, 2019 in the House:
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- House adopts resolution to go outside bounds
- House adopts conference committee report
- Record vote
On May 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- House adopts conf. comm. report-reported
- Senate adopts resolution to go outside bounds
- Senate adopts conference committee report
- Record vote
On May 24, 2019 in the House:
- Corrected Conference Committee Report distributed
On May 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Corrected Conference committee report filed
On May 24, 2019 in the House:
- Conf. Comm. Report distributed
On May 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Conference committee report filed
On May 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- House appoints conferees-reported
- House grants request for conf comm-reported
On May 10, 2019 in the House:
- House appoints conferees
- House grants request for conference committee
On May 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate refuses to concur
- House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
- Read
- Senate requests conference committee
On May 7, 2019 in the House:
- Senate appoints conferees-reported
- Senate refuses to concur-reported
- Senate requests conference committee-reported
On May 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate appoints conferees
On May 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- House passage as amended reported
On May 1, 2019 in the House:
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
On April 30, 2019 in the House:
- Point of order withdrawn (amendment)
- Amendment(s) offered
- Point of order sustained (amendment)
- Amendment tabled
- Amendment(s) offered
- Point of order sustained (amendment)
- Amendment(s) offered
- Amended
- Point of order sustained (amendment)
- Record vote
- Amendment tabled
- Record vote
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Amended
- Amendment tabled
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Amendment tabled
- Amendment tabled
- Record vote
- Amended
- Amended
- Amendment(s) offered
- Amendment amended
- Laid out in lieu of companion
- Read 2nd time
- Amended
- Amended
- Amended
- Amendment tabled
- Amendment withdrawn
- Amendment(s) offered
- Amendment adopted as amended
- Amended
- Amended
- Amendment tabled
- Record vote
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Amendment(s) offered
- Point of order sustained (amendment)
- Amendment(s) offered
- Amendment amended
- Amendment adopted as amended
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
- Amendment tabled
- Amended
- Amendment adopted as amended
- Amended
- Amended
- Amendment tabled
- Record vote
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Amended
- Amended
- Amended
- Record vote
- Amended
- Amended
- Amended
- Amendment fails of adoption
- Record vote
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Passed to 3rd reading as amended
- Record vote
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Amendment amended
- Amendment(s) offered
- Amendment tabled
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Amendment tabled
- Record vote
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Amendment withdrawn
- Amendment tabled
- Record vote
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Amended
- Amendment tabled
- Record vote
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Amendment tabled
- Record vote
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Amendment tabled
- Record vote
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Amendment tabled
- Record vote
On April 29, 2019 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On April 28, 2019 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 25, 2019 in the House:
- Considered in formal meeting
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Committee substitute considered in committee
On April 16, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Ways & Means
- Read first time
- Received from the Senate
On April 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Amendment to amendment fails of adoption
- Record vote
- Amendment to amendment offered
- Amendment to amendment withdrawn
- Amendment to amendment offered
- Amendment to amendment withdrawn
- Amendment to amendment offered
- Amendment to amendment withdrawn
- Amendment to amendment offered
- Amendment to amendment offered
- Record vote
- Amendment to amendment offered
- Amendment to amendment fails of adoption
- Record vote
- Amendment to amendment offered
- Amendment to amendment fails of adoption
- Record vote
- Amendment to amendment offered
- Amendment to amendment fails of adoption
- Record vote
- Amendment to amendment fails of adoption
- Amendment to amendment offered
- Record vote
- Amendment to amendment tabled
- Co-author authorized
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Record vote
- Read 2nd time
- Amendment(s) offered
- Amendment to amendment offered
- Amendment amended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Amendment to amendment offered
- Record vote
- Amendment to amendment fails of adoption
- Amendment to amendment offered
- Amendment to amendment fails of adoption
- Record vote
- Amendment to amendment offered
- Amendment to amendment fails of adoption
- Record vote
- Amendment to amendment offered
- Amendment to amendment fails of adoption
- Record vote
- Amendment to amendment fails of adoption
- Amendment to amendment offered
- Amendment to amendment fails of adoption
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Amendment to amendment fails of adoption
- Record vote
- Amendment adopted as amended
- Record vote
- Passed to engrossment as amended
- Amendment to amendment offered
- Remarks ordered printed
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Record vote
- Amendment(s) offered
- Record vote
- Amendment withdrawn
- Amendment(s) offered
- Amended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Passed as amended
- Record vote
- Reason for vote recorded in Journal
- Remarks ordered printed
- Reported engrossed
- Amendment to amendment offered
- Record vote
- Amendment to amendment fails of adoption
- Amendment to amendment withdrawn
- Amendment to amendment fails of adoption
- Record vote
- Amendment to amendment offered
- Amendment to amendment fails of adoption
- Record vote
- Amendment to amendment offered
- Amendment to amendment fails of adoption
- Record vote
- Amendment to amendment offered
- Amendment to amendment offered
- Amendment to amendment offered
- Amendment to amendment fails of adoption
- Record vote
- Amendment to amendment offered
- Amendment to amendment withdrawn
- Amendment to amendment offered
- Record vote
- Amendment to amendment offered
- Amendment to amendment fails of adoption
- Record vote
On April 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Co-author authorized
On April 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On February 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Co-author authorized
On February 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Co-author authorized
On February 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
On February 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably as substituted
On February 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on 2/11/2019
On February 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on 2/6/2019
- Co-author authorized
On February 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Property Tax
- Read first time
On January 31, 2019 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsors (85)
Type:
Primary Sponsor