+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (20)
On May 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Not again placed on intent calendar
On May 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On May 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Not again placed on intent calendar
On May 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On May 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Co-author authorized
On May 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably as substituted
On April 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
On April 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
- Considered in public hearing
- Left pending in committee
On April 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Intergovernmental Relations
- Read first time
On March 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor