+ − Actions (37)
On May 18, 2009 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On May 15, 2009 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Considered in formal meeting
- Committee report printed and distributed
On May 12, 2009 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On April 16, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to Public Education
- Read first time
On April 6, 2009 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On April 2, 2009 in the Senate:
- Three day rule suspended
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
- Record vote
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
- Reported engrossed
On March 31, 2009 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On March 25, 2009 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
On March 24, 2009 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
- Considered in public hearing
On March 18, 2009 in the Senate:
- Meeting cancelled
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 17, 2009 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On February 10, 2009 in the Senate:
- Referred to Education
- Read first time
On November 10, 2008 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate