+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (55)
On June 14, 2019 in the House:
- Effective on . . . . . . . . . . . . . . .
- Signed by the Governor
On May 25, 2019 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
- Signed in the House
On May 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported enrolled
On May 21, 2019 in the House:
- Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
On May 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Record vote
- Senate concurs in House amendment(s)
- Read
- House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
On May 14, 2019 in the House:
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
On May 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- House passage as amended reported
On May 13, 2019 in the House:
- Passed to 3rd reading
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on General State Calendar
On May 10, 2019 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On May 8, 2019 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On May 7, 2019 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On May 1, 2019 in the House:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
On April 24, 2019 in the House:
- Scheduled for public hearing on4/24/2019
- Considered in public hearing
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Left pending in committee
On April 17, 2019 in the House:
- Recalled from subcommittee
On April 3, 2019 in the House:
- Referred directly to subcommittee by chair
On April 1, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Transportation
- Read first time
On March 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Record vote
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Three day rule suspended
- Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
- Reported engrossed
On March 27, 2019 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On March 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On March 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Reported favorably as substituted
On March 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
On March 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on 3/6/2019
On February 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Transportation
- Read first time
On November 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate