+ − Actions (57)
On June 19, 2009 in the House:
- Effective on 9/1/09
- Signed by the Governor
On June 1, 2009 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
- Signed in the House
On May 31, 2009 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 29, 2009 in the Senate:
- Reported enrolled
On May 29, 2009 in the House:
- Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
On May 29, 2009 in the Senate:
- Record vote
- Senate concurs in House amendment(s)
- Read
- House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
On May 27, 2009 in the Senate:
- House passage as amended reported
On May 26, 2009 in the House:
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
On May 24, 2009 in the House:
- Amended
- Amended
- Read 2nd time
- Passed to 3rd reading as amended
On May 22, 2009 in the House:
- Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
On May 21, 2009 in the House:
- Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
- Rules suspended
- Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On May 19, 2009 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
- Considered in formal meeting
On May 18, 2009 in the House:
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
- Left pending in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
On May 1, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to Public Safety
- Read first time
On April 23, 2009 in the Senate:
- Three day rule suspended
- Placed on local & uncontested calendar
- Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Laid before the Senate
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
- Reported engrossed
On April 23, 2009 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On April 14, 2009 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably as substituted
On April 6, 2009 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
On April 1, 2009 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 24, 2009 in the Senate:
- Referred to Transportation & Homeland Sec.
- Read first time
On March 12, 2009 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor