+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (60)
On June 15, 2017 in the House:
- Vetoed by the Governor
On May 28, 2017 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
- Signed in the House
On May 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
- Reported enrolled
On May 27, 2017 in the House:
- Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
On May 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Record vote
- Senate concurs in House amendment(s)
- Read
- House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
On May 24, 2017 in the House:
- Constitutional three day rule suspended
- Record vote
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
On May 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- House passage as amended reported
On May 23, 2017 in the House:
- Passed to 3rd reading as amended
- Vote reconsidered
- 1 hr. notice-for reconsideration
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Failed to pass to 3rd reading
- Amended
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on General State Calendar
On May 21, 2017 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On May 20, 2017 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On May 19, 2017 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
- Committee report distributed
On May 17, 2017 in the House:
- Considered in formal meeting
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
On May 8, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Public Education
- Read first time
On May 2, 2017 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On May 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported engrossed
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
- Record vote
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
On May 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Record vote
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
- Record vote
On April 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On April 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- Co-author authorized
On April 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Reported favorably as substituted
On April 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
On April 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On February 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Co-author authorized
On January 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Education
- Read first time
On November 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate