+ − Actions (33)
On May 22, 2009 in the House:
- 1 hr. notice-to suspend rules
On May 20, 2009 in the House:
- Placed on General State Calendar
On May 18, 2009 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On May 11, 2009 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On May 6, 2009 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Considered in formal meeting
On May 1, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to Public Health
- Read first time
On April 27, 2009 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On April 24, 2009 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Three day rule suspended
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
- Reported engrossed
On April 23, 2009 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On April 22, 2009 in the Senate:
- Not again placed on intent calendar
On April 21, 2009 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On April 17, 2009 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Committee report printed and distributed
On April 14, 2009 in the Senate:
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 24, 2009 in the Senate:
- Referred to Health & Human Services
- Read first time
On March 12, 2009 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate