+ − Actions (34)
On May 22, 2009 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On May 21, 2009 in the House:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On May 19, 2009 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Considered in formal meeting
On May 18, 2009 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On May 5, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to Public Safety
- Read first time
On April 30, 2009 in the Senate:
- Placed on local & uncontested calendar
- Laid before the Senate
- Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Three day rule suspended
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
- Reported engrossed
On April 30, 2009 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On April 21, 2009 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
On April 20, 2009 in the Senate:
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably as substituted
On April 17, 2009 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
On April 15, 2009 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 24, 2009 in the Senate:
- Referred to Intergovernmental Relations
- Read first time
On March 12, 2009 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor