+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (48)
On May 30, 2011 in the House:
- Effective on 9/1/11
- Signed by the Governor
On May 26, 2011 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
- Signed in the House
On May 25, 2011 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 23, 2011 in the House:
- Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
- Read 2nd time
- Passed to 3rd reading
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
- Constitutional three day rule suspended
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Record vote
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
On May 23, 2011 in the Senate:
- House passage reported
- Reported enrolled
On May 23, 2011 in the House:
- Passed
On May 21, 2011 in the House:
- Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
- Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
On May 20, 2011 in the House:
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
- Considered in formal meeting
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On May 19, 2011 in the Senate:
- Record vote
- Placed on local & uncontested calendar
- Laid before the Senate
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Three day rule suspended
- Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
- Read 3rd time
- Record vote
- Reported engrossed
On May 19, 2011 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
- Read first time
- Referred to House Administration
On May 19, 2011 in the Senate:
- Passed
On May 18, 2011 in the Senate:
- Co-author authorized
On May 17, 2011 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
On May 4, 2011 in the Senate:
- Referred to Administration
- Read first time
- Permission to introduce
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate