+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (24)
On May 17, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Special Purpose Districts
On May 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Three day rule suspended
- Placed on local & uncontested calendar
On May 17, 2013 in the House:
- Read first time
On May 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Laid before the Senate
- Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Not again placed on intent calendar
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
- Reported engrossed
On May 17, 2013 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On May 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On May 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Co-author authorized
On May 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
On May 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On May 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Intergovernmental Relations
- Read first time
On May 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor