+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On May 6, 2011 in the Senate:
- Not again placed on intent calendar
On May 5, 2011 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On May 2, 2011 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On April 18, 2011 in the Senate:
- Referred to International Relations and Trade
- Read first time
- Permission to introduce
On April 15, 2011 in the Senate:
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor