+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (85)
On June 14, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor
- Effective on 9/1/13
On May 28, 2013 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 27, 2013 in the House:
- Signed in the House
On May 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
- Reported enrolled
On May 26, 2013 in the House:
- Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
On May 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate adopts conference committee report
- Record vote
On May 26, 2013 in the House:
- House adopts conference committee report
- Record vote
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
On May 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- House adopts conf. comm. report-reported
On May 25, 2013 in the House:
- Conf. Comm. Report distributed
On May 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Conference committee report filed
- House appoints conferees-reported
- House grants request for conf comm-reported
On May 25, 2013 in the House:
- House appoints conferees
- House grants request for conference committee
On May 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate refuses to concur
- House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
- Read
On May 24, 2013 in the House:
- Senate appoints conferees-reported
On May 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate requests conference committee
- Senate appoints conferees
On May 24, 2013 in the House:
- Senate refuses to concur-reported
- Senate requests conference committee-reported
On May 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- House passage as amended reported
On May 9, 2013 in the House:
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
On May 8, 2013 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
- Committee report distributed
- Committee report sent to Calendars
- Recommitted to committee
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in formal meeting
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
- Amended
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
- Passed to 3rd reading as amended
- Committee report distributed
- Read 2nd time
- Laid out in lieu of companion
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On May 7, 2013 in the House:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Scheduled for formal meeting on . . .
- Considered in formal meeting
On May 6, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Homeland Security & Public Safety
- Read first time
On May 1, 2013 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On April 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed to engrossment as amended
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Read 2nd time
- Amendment(s) offered
- Amended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Three day rule suspended
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
- Reported engrossed
On April 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
- Co-author authorized
On April 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
- Co-author authorized
On April 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On April 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On April 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Criminal Justice
- Read first time
- Posting rule suspended
- Record vote
- Permission to introduce
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor