+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On May 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Not again placed on intent calendar
On April 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On April 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Reported favorably as substituted
On April 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On April 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On April 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Agriculture, Rural Affairs & Homeland Security
- Read first time
- Co-author authorized
- Permission to introduce
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor