+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (46)
On May 20, 2013 in the House:
- Returned to committee
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on General State Calendar
- Point of order sustained
On May 16, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On May 15, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
On May 14, 2013 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Considered in formal meeting
On May 13, 2013 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Considered in public hearing
On May 8, 2013 in the House:
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Left pending in committee
On May 4, 2013 in the House:
- Posting rule suspended
On May 1, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Public Health
- Read first time
On April 23, 2013 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On April 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Read 2nd time
- Amendment(s) offered
- Amended
- Read 3rd time
- Passed to engrossment as amended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Three day rule suspended
- Record vote
- Passed
- Record vote
- Reported engrossed
On April 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On March 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Co-author authorized
On February 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Reported favorably as substituted
On February 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On January 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Co-author authorized
On January 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Health & Human Services
- Read first time
On January 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate