+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (44)
On June 17, 2011 in the House:
- Filed without the Governor's signature
- Effective immediately
On May 27, 2011 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 26, 2011 in the House:
- Signed in the House
On May 26, 2011 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
- Reported enrolled
On May 25, 2011 in the House:
- Read 3rd time
- Read 2nd time
- Passed to 3rd reading
- Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
- Passed
- Record vote
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
On May 25, 2011 in the Senate:
- House passage reported
On May 23, 2011 in the House:
- Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
On May 20, 2011 in the House:
- Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On May 17, 2011 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
- Considered in formal meeting
On May 3, 2011 in the Senate:
- Record vote
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Three day rule suspended
On May 3, 2011 in the House:
- Read first time
On May 3, 2011 in the Senate:
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
- Reported engrossed
On May 3, 2011 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
- Referred to Natural Resources
On May 2, 2011 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On April 29, 2011 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Committee report printed and distributed
On April 27, 2011 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
On April 20, 2011 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On April 13, 2011 in the Senate:
- Referred to Intergovernmental Relations
- Read first time
On April 11, 2011 in the Senate:
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor