+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (45)
On May 25, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor
- Effective immediately
On May 14, 2013 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
- Signed in the House
On May 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported enrolled
- House passage reported
On May 10, 2013 in the House:
- Passed to 3rd reading
- Laid out in lieu of companion
- Read 2nd time
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
On May 9, 2013 in the House:
- Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
- Considered in formal meeting
- Scheduled for formal meeting on . . .
On May 6, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Ways & Means
- Read first time
On April 30, 2013 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On April 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported engrossed
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
- Record vote
- Three day rule suspended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Placed on intent calendar
On April 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Co-author authorized
- Not again placed on intent calendar
On April 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On April 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
On April 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On April 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Open Government
- Read first time
- Permission to introduce
On April 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate