+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (21)
On May 2, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Special Purpose Districts
- Read first time
On May 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Record vote
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Three day rule suspended
- Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
- Reported engrossed
On May 1, 2013 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On April 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On April 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
On April 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On April 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Intergovernmental Relations
- Read first time
On April 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor