+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (36)
On May 21, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on General State Calendar
On May 19, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On May 17, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On May 16, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On May 15, 2013 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Considered in formal meeting
On May 13, 2013 in the House:
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
- Considered in public hearing
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Left pending in committee
On May 6, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Government Efficiency & Reform
- Read first time
On April 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Three day rule suspended
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
- Remarks ordered printed
- Reported engrossed
On April 25, 2013 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On April 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On April 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Reported favorably as substituted
On April 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
On April 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On April 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Open Government
- Read first time
- Permission to introduce
On April 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsors (17)
Type:
Primary Sponsor