+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (30)
On May 21, 2011 in the House:
- Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
On May 20, 2011 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
- Committee report distributed
On May 17, 2011 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
- Considered in formal meeting
On May 11, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Natural Resources
- Read first time
On May 10, 2011 in the Senate:
- Three day rule suspended
- Placed on local & uncontested calendar
- Laid before the Senate
- Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
- Reported engrossed
On May 10, 2011 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On April 29, 2011 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Committee report printed and distributed
On April 27, 2011 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
On April 20, 2011 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 24, 2011 in the Senate:
- Referred to Intergovernmental Relations
- Read first time
On March 17, 2011 in the Senate:
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor