+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (23)
On April 4, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence
- Read first time
On March 26, 2013 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On March 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Three day rule suspended
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
- Reported engrossed
On March 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On March 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
On March 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On January 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Criminal Justice
- Read first time
On January 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor