+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (32)
On May 20, 2011 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Considered in formal meeting
On May 11, 2011 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On May 3, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Transportation
- Read first time
On May 2, 2011 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Read 2nd time
- Amendment(s) offered
- Amended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Passed to engrossment as amended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Three day rule suspended
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
- Reported engrossed
On May 2, 2011 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On April 28, 2011 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On April 26, 2011 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Reported favorably as substituted
On April 20, 2011 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 24, 2011 in the Senate:
- Referred to Transportation & Homeland Sec.
- Read first time
On March 11, 2011 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor