+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (55)
On June 14, 2013 in the House:
- Effective immediately
- Signed by the Governor
On May 27, 2013 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 26, 2013 in the House:
- Signed in the House
On May 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported enrolled
On May 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- House passage reported
On May 22, 2013 in the House:
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
- Read 2nd time
- Passed to 3rd reading
- Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
On May 21, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
On May 20, 2013 in the House:
- Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
On May 18, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
On May 17, 2013 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On May 16, 2013 in the House:
- Scheduled for formal meeting on . . .
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
- Considered in formal meeting
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
On May 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on local & uncontested calendar
- Laid before the Senate
- Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Three day rule suspended
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Reported engrossed
On May 8, 2013 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
- Read first time
- Referred to County Affairs
On May 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Not again placed on intent calendar
On May 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On April 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably as substituted
On April 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
- Considered in public hearing
- Testimony taken in committee
On April 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On April 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On April 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Intergovernmental Relations
- Read first time
- Permission to introduce
On April 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor