+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (43)
On May 10, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor
- Effective immediately
On May 7, 2013 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
- Signed in the House
On May 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported enrolled
- House passage reported
On May 4, 2013 in the House:
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
On May 3, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
- Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
- Laid out in lieu of companion
- Read 2nd time
- Passed to 3rd reading
On May 1, 2013 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
- Considered in public hearing
On April 16, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Urban Affairs
- Read first time
On March 13, 2013 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On March 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported engrossed
- Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
- Record vote
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Record vote
- Co-author authorized
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Three day rule suspended
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
On March 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On February 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Co-author authorized
On February 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
On February 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On January 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Health & Human Services
- Read first time
On January 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate