+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (22)
On May 6, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to County Affairs
- Read first time
On May 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Three day rule suspended
- Placed on local & uncontested calendar
- Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Laid before the Senate
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
- Reported engrossed
On May 2, 2013 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On April 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably as substituted
On April 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Intergovernmental Relations
- Read first time
- Permission to introduce
On March 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor