+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On April 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Removed from local & uncontested calendar
- Placed on local & uncontested calendar
On April 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
On April 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on 4/4/2019
On April 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Posting rule suspended
On March 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Business & Commerce
- Read first time
On March 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor